Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779071

EP2779071 - Mobile display device with flip-screen functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2015  [2015/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yume, Inc.
1204 Middlefield Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Doser, Andrew
2941 Salem Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date14158721.211.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131384440115.03.2013         Original published format: US201313844401
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779071
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mobile Anzeigevorrichtung mit Flip-screen-Funktionalität[2014/38]
English:Mobile display device with flip-screen functionality[2014/38]
French:Dispositif d'affichage mobile avec une fonctionnalité de retournement d'écran[2014/38]
Examination procedure11.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
18.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/46]
30.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/46]
Documents cited:Search   [] - No relevant documents disclosed,
by applicant   - DAVID J. KAPPOS, "Subject Matter Eligibility of Computer Readable Media", UNDER SECRETARY OF COMMERCE FOR INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AND DIRECTOR OF THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, (20100126),