Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787456 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2787456



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 214
10.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
10.07.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
21.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
21.07.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
21.07.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
21.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
21.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
22.12.2014 European search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79
11.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
11.03.2014 Description Search / examination 45
11.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 20
11.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5