Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787456


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.07.2019 First examination report
05.07.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2015 Amendment by applicant
19.12.2014 Publication of search report published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
19.12.2014 Change - classification published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
07.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]