Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787456

EP2787456 - Creating ergonomic manikin postures and controlling computer-aided design environments using natural user interfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zayic, Jerry Dean
9725 East Marginal Way South
Tukwila, WA 98108 / US
02 / Nelson, Bruce L.
P.O. Box 3707, MC 7J-43
Seattle, WA 98124-2207 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14158859.011.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS20131385791405.04.2013         Original published format: US201313857914
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787456
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787456
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erzeugung ergonomischer Modellpuppenposen und Steuerung rechnergestützter Entwurfsumgebungen unter Verwendung natürlicher Benutzerschnittstellen[2014/41]
English:Creating ergonomic manikin postures and controlling computer-aided design environments using natural user interfaces[2014/41]
French:Création des postures de mannequin ergonomique et contrôle d'environnements de conception assistée par ordinateur utilisant des interfaces utilisateur naturelles[2014/41]
Examination procedure11.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
21.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]  - C Père ET AL, "Original Paper Full body motion capture in CAD environment", Proceedings of Virtual Concept 2006, Cancún, Mexico, November 27th - December 1st, 2006, (20061127), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.ensam.eu/content/download/1822/12427/schedule/shedule.pdf, (20141211), XP055158078 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *