Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778023

EP2778023 - Electrical power steering phase voltage output diagnosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steering Solutions IP Holding Corporation
3900 Holland Road
Saginaw, MI 48601 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Erlenbeck, Jason M.
12889 Frost Road
Hemlock, MI Michigan 48626 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/38]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14158983.811.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS201361777618P12.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361777618 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2778023
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2778023
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2778023
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:B62D5/04
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Servolenkungsphasenspannungsausgangsdiagnose[2014/38]
English:Electrical power steering phase voltage output diagnosis[2014/38]
French:Diagnostic de sortie de tension de phase à alimentation assistée électrique[2014/38]
Examination procedure18.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2017Fee for grant paid
02.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2017
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB11.03.2018
IE11.03.2018
LU11.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/12]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
GB11.03.2018
IE11.03.2018
LU11.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
Former [2019/09]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.03.2018
LU11.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU11.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1298783  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1961644  (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]US6271637  (KUSHION MARK DENNIS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002172509  (KAMEYA HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5592355  (IKKAI YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *