Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779417

EP2779417 - Control method and device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
5005 East McDowell Road
Phoenix, AZ 85008 / US
For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
5005 East McDowell Road
Phoenix, AZ 85008 / US
For all designated states
Universiteit Gent
Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25
9000 Gent / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Derammelaere, Stijn
Schipstraat 4/102
8530 Harelbeke / BE
02 / Stockman, Kurt
St-Denijsplaats 40
8554 Sint-Denijs / BE
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Clarke, Geoffrey Howard
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date14159137.012.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS201361778255P12.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361778255 P
US20141420066307.03.2014         Original published format: US201414200663
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2779417
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2779417
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02P6/18, H02P25/02, H02P23/14
[2015/24]
Former International [2014/38]H02P6/18, H02P25/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Steuerungsverfahren und Vorrichtung dafür[2014/38]
English:Control method and device therefor[2014/38]
French:Procédé de commande et dispositif correspondant[2014/38]
Examination procedure08.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
18.03.2016Request for further processing filed
18.03.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.04.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2358255  (STEBON LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 4-6,12;
 [X]EP2034604  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5883344  (COLBY ROY STEPHEN [US] ET AL) [A] 4-6,12 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - line 67 *;
 [A]EP2546979  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 4-6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0069] *;
 [A]EP2192413  (ABB OY [FI]) [A] 1,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] *