Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790383

EP2790383 - DISTRIBUTION CONTROL SYSTEM, DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, DISTRIBUTION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]Distribution control system, distribution system, distribution control method, and computer-readable storage medium
[2017/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Kasatani, Kiyoshi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Former [2014/42]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date14159150.312.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013005442715.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013054427
JP2014002899118.02.2014         Original published format: JP 2014028991
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790383
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2790383
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790383
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F21/55, H04N7/18, H04N21/2365, H04L29/06
[2017/38]
Former International [2015/12]H04L29/06
Former International [2014/42]H04L29/08, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:VERTEILUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM, VERTEILUNGSSYSTEM, VERTEILUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM[2017/42]
English:DISTRIBUTION CONTROL SYSTEM, DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, DISTRIBUTION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM[2017/42]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISTRIBUTION, SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2017/42]
Former [2014/42]Verteilungssteuerungssystem, Verteilungssystem, Verteilungssteuerungsverfahren und computerlesbares Speichermedium
Former [2014/42]Distribution control system, distribution system, distribution control method, and computer-readable storage medium
Former [2014/42]Système et procédé de commande de distribution, système de distribution et support de stockage lisible par ordinateur
Examination procedure12.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
26.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2018Fee for grant paid
16.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2017
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE12.03.2018
LU12.03.2018
MT12.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE12.03.2018
LU12.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE12.03.2018
LU12.03.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2019/04]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
LU12.03.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US8384753  (BEDINGFIELD SR JAMES CARLTON [US]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,2,10 * * column 1, line 31 - line 45 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 19 - column 9, line 21 * * column 12, line 28 - line 48 * * column 13, line 2 - line 48 *;
 [X]EP1327940  (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,11,12 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0006] , [0054] - [0057] - [0069] , [0080] * * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]US2010057830  (TAKALA JARI AARNO TAPANI [FI]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0022] , [0027] - [0034] *;
 [A]EP1970835  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,5-7 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0019] - [0045] , [0048] , [0051] , [0056] , [0067] , [0068] *
by applicantJP2007221229