Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787392

EP2787392 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Han Jun
207-1506, Hyundai Apt.
201-215, Hosu Maeul 2
Danji, Janghang 2-dong
Ilsandong-gu, Gyeonggi-do
Goyang-si / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Waddington, Richard
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date14159244.412.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003212926.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130032129
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787392
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787392
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung[2014/41]
English:Image forming apparatus[2014/41]
French:Appareil de formation d'image[2014/41]
Examination procedure12.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
19.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/06]
24.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/06]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2012134701  (SUE TOMOHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 6;
 [X]US6321044  (TANAKA TOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *;
 [XAY]US2010014878  (TOMITA NORIO [JP]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 3 [Y] 6;
 [X]JP2009063748  (KYOCERA MITA CORP) [X] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document *