Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787392 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2787392



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 72
05.01.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
16.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
16.01.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
12.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2014 Description Search / examination 9
12.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
12.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4