Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787392


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.01.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
23.09.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.02.2015 Change - representative
16.01.2015 Publication of search report published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
16.01.2015 Change - classification published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
07.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]