Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784614 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784614



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 96
12.06.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
01.03.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
22.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
17.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.05.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
01.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
14.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2014 Description Search / examination 22
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
14.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4