Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784614


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.05.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
28.02.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.09.2016 First examination report
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.08.2015 Change - designated states published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - request for examination published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
18.08.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.03.2015 Publication of search report published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]