Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784614 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410015219 EP14159727



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014259615Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013055242 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5741616BGlobal Dossier 01.07.2015B2
JP2014182470 29.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013055242 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104062949Global Dossier 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013055242 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2784614Global Dossier 29.04.2015A3
EP2784614 01.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
JP2013055242 18.03.2013