Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784614

EP2784614 - Production system and production method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.07.2017  [2017/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Fukuda, Takuya
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / Ando, Shingo
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14159727.814.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013005524218.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013055242
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784614
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784614
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418, B25J9/16
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/40]G05B19/418
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Produktionssystem und Produktionsverfahren[2014/40]
English:Production system and production method[2014/40]
French:Système et procédé de production[2014/40]
Examination procedure17.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
22.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/29]
01.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/29]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2012218093  (CANON KK) [YD] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] * * page 16 - page 40 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5442561  (YOSHIZAWA MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 14 - column 17 *;
 [A]US2011030185  (MIZUTA KEIJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6308107  (CONBOY MICHAEL R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7620470  (HICKEY SUSAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - JAMES C BEAN ET AL, "Matchup Scheduling with Multiple Resources, Release Dates and Disruptions", OPERATIONS RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19910601), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:10.1287/OPRE.39.3.470, ISSN 0030-364X, pages 470 - 483, XP008175568 [Y] 1-10 * page 470 * * page 474 - page 477 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1287/opre.39.3.470