Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784034

EP2784034 - Process for making large core multimode optical fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OFS Fitel, LLC
2000 Northeast Expressway
Norcross, GA 30071 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Alonzo, John C.
40 Zeller Drive
Somerset, NJ 08873 / US
02 / Braganza, David D.
555 Worcester Street 204
Southbridge, MA 01566 / US
03 / Brodeur, Merrill H.
8 Anna Street
Ware, MA 01082 / US
04 / Fleming, James W.
245 Tuttle Parkway
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
 [2014/49]
Former [2014/40]01 / Alonzo, John C.
29 Winthrop Road
Somerset, NJ 08873 / US
02 / Braganza, David D.
555 Worcester Street 204
Southbridge, MA 01566 / US
03 / Brodeur, Merrill H.
8 Anna Street
Ware, MA 01082 / US
04 / Fleming, James W.
245 Tuttle Parkway
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2017/23]
Former [2014/40]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date14159862.314.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS20131383497315.03.2013         Original published format: US201313834973
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784034
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784034
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/018
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstelen von multimodalen optischen Fasern mit großem Kern[2016/41]
English:Process for making large core multimode optical fibers[2014/40]
French:Procédé de fabrication des fibres optiques multimodes à grand noyau[2014/40]
Former [2014/40]Verfahren zum Herstellen von multimodalen optischen Fasern mit großem Kern
Examination procedure13.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
02.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2017Fee for grant paid
01.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2015
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201704   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP2070885  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC NORTH AM INC [US]) [YD] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP2377824  (DRAKA COMTEQ BV [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0069]; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2011067451  (FLEMING JAMES [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US2005000253  (XIE KANG [CN] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0067]; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP2279984  (DRAKA COMTEQ BV [NL]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0064] , [0065]; claims 1,7,14 *;
 [A]EP0005963  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 10-28; claims 1,7-9 *