Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793506

EP2793506 - User equipment reporting of the detection of blindly configured secondary cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2020New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Dalsgaard, Lars
Torpantie 56
90230 Oulu / FI
02 / Nielsen, Sari
Bredankuja 7 G 25
Espoo 02750 / FI
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Laine IP Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date14159868.014.03.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateUS201361812197P15.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361812197 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793506
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04L5/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Benutzergerätmeldung des Nachweises von blind konfigurierten Sekundärzellen[2014/43]
English:User equipment reporting of the detection of blindly configured secondary cell[2014/43]
French:Rapport d'équipement utilisateur de la détection de cellule secondaire configurée à l'aveugle[2014/43]
Examination procedure19.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/14]
02.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AP]WO2014015810  (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [AP] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039] *
 [XI]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting 66; R4-130402; SCell Reporting Issues", vol. RAN WG4, no. St. Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130121), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-130402, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_66/Docs/, (20130121), XP050675151 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * (detailed text passages in search opinion) * [I] 14,15
 [A]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting 63AH; R4-63AH-0143; SCell activation/deactivation timing", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-63AH-0143, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120621), vol. RAN WG4, no. Oulu; 20120626 - 20120628, XP050615155 [A] 1-15 * par. "Interband CA"; page 2 *
 [A]  - NOKIA CORPORATION, "3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting 65; R4-126498; SCell activation time discussion", vol. RAN WG4, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121105), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-126498, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_65/Docs/, (20121105), XP050674027 [A] 1-15 * pages 1/2, par. 3. Discussion on blind configuration of SCell; page 2, par. 4. Discussion on non-blind configuration; page 3, par. 5. Conclusion *