Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783812

EP2783812 - Robot device and method for manufacturing an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2017  [2017/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiyama, Tomoyuki
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / Kamiya, Yosuke
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14159874.814.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013005523818.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013055238
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783812
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783812
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16, G05B19/425
[2015/14]
Former International [2014/40]B25J9/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Robotervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Objekts[2014/40]
English:Robot device and method for manufacturing an object[2014/40]
French:Dispositif de robot et procédé de fabrication d'un objet[2014/40]
Examination procedure08.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/11]
02.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012290130  (KAPOOR CHETAN [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,10;
 [XI]US2004189631  (KAZI ARIF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0116] * [I] 3-7,9,10;
 [XI]JP2011251395  (TAKAMARU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 3-8,10;
 [A]EP1864764  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0067] *;
 [A]WO2011140704  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2011080882