Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779700

EP2779700 - Hearing aid using wireless test modes as diagnostic tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starkey Laboratories, Inc.
6600 Washington Avenue South
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Solum, Jeffrey Paul
6115 Club Valley Road
Shorewood Minnesota 55331 / US
02 / Polinske, Beau Jay
4705 Blaisdell Ave.
Minneapolis Minnesota 55419 / US
03 / Flood, Stephen Paul
9878 Lee Drive
Eden Prairie Minnesota 55347 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Bird & Bird LLP
Großer Grasbrook 9
20457 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14159982.914.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131384372515.03.2013         Original published format: US201313843725
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779700
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Hörhilfe mit drahtlosen Prüfmodalitäten als Diagnosewerkzeug[2014/38]
English:Hearing aid using wireless test modes as diagnostic tool[2014/38]
French:Prothèse auditive à l'aide de modes d'essai sans fil comme outil de diagnostic[2014/38]
Examination procedure14.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
17.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2017
01.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/44]
24.06.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/44]
Divisional application(s)EP17173806.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.08.2016Request for further processing filed
31.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.09.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2009063097  (PHONAK AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-4,11 * figure 1 * * page 9, lines 5-18 * * page 10, lines 1-9 * * page 11, lines 3-10 * [Y] 5-10,12-15;
 [Y]US2010054512  (SOLUM JEFFREY PAUL [US]) [Y] 5-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0042] , [0044] , [0051] *;
 [A]WO2007068243  (WIDEX AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * abstract *
by applicantUS2006274747
 US2007110193
 US20140954107