Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815951

EP2815951 - Method and device for providing travel route of portable medical diagnosis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Myeong-je
302-1004 Donga 3-Cha Apt.
Sindorim-dong
Guro-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Jacobs, Bart , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date14160012.214.03.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateKR2013006995718.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130069957
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2815951
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2815951
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815951
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:B62D15/02, A61B5/055, G05D1/02, A61B8/00, G01C21/00, G08B7/00, G08G1/16
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/52]B62D15/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bereitstellen von Reiserouten einer tragbaren medizinischen Diagnosevorrichtung[2014/52]
English:Method and device for providing travel route of portable medical diagnosis apparatus[2014/52]
French:Procédé et dispositif de fourniture d'itinéraire d'un appareil de diagnostic médical portatif[2014/52]
Examination procedure11.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
03.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2016Fee for grant paid
30.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2016
Opposition(s)23.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2014
AT22.02.2017
CY22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU14.03.2014
AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/24]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/13]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/10]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
LU14.03.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/07]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
FR24.04.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2008161672  (MARAR RAJEEV RAMANKUTTY [US]) [Y] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] , [0030] - [0034]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-7,11-15;
 [YA]JP2011028609  (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0128] , [0129]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-7,11-15;
 [A]JP2004313587  (MIKISHII KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2008302116  (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA MEDICAL SYS CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH1116057  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *