Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778749

EP2778749 - Presbyopia lens with pupil size correction based on level of refractive error [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2019Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc.
7500 Centurion Parkway
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Wooley, Benjamin C.
7931 Mount Ranier Drive
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
02 / Haywood, James William
1915 Salt Myrtle Lane
Fleming Island, FL 32003 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date14160102.114.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131382801214.03.2013         Original published format: US201313828012
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2778749
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2778749
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02, A61F2/16, G02C7/04
[2014/48]
Former International [2014/38]G02C7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Presbyopie-Linse mit Pupillengrößenkorrektur auf Grundlage des Brechungsfehlergrads[2014/38]
English:Presbyopia lens with pupil size correction based on level of refractive error[2014/38]
French:Lentille de presbytie avec correction de la taille de la pupille basée sur le niveau de correction d'une erreur de réfraction[2014/38]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
29.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007258042  (WOOLEY C B [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16-21,25 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]EP0742464  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [A] 1-12,16-21,25 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [XI]US2009059167  (WOOLEY C BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 13,22-24 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] * * claims 7,9 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] * [I] 14,15;
 [A]US5929969  (ROFFMAN JEFFREY H [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 5, line 9 - line 37 * * column 7, line 36 - line 55; figure 6 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 8 * * column 12, line 7 - line 18 *