Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790127

EP2790127 - Image processing device, image processing method, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Irie, Atsushi
c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Kilian Kilian & Partner
Aidenbachstraße 54
81379 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14160298.717.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008056508.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013080565
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790127
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2790127
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G06K9/62
[2016/04]
Former International [2014/42]G06K9/00, G06K9/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/32]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren, und computerlesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium[2014/42]
English:Image processing device, image processing method, and recording medium[2014/42]
French:Dispositif de traitement d'image, procédé de traitement d'image, et support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur[2014/42]
Examination procedure27.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/32]
27.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012257799  (YANO KOTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US2012243742  (SATO YOICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0204] * * paragraph [0248] - paragraph [0249] * * paragraph [0253] * * paragraph [0257] * * figures 19-21 *;
 [A]WO2012169251  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]; IRIE ATSUSHI) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0137] *;
 EP2720194  [ ] (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2010205177  (SATO HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 4,12,15 *