Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787518

EP2787518 - Two-step connection of electric motors by means of electromagnetic switches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc.
1 Allen-Bradley Drive
Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / James J. Kinsella
3009 York Road
TN, 37146 Pleasant View / US
02 / Peter Unsworth
12 Winterbourne Mews Lewes
BN7 1HG Sussex / GB
03 / Christopher J. Wieloch
18200 Beverly Hills Drive
Brookfiled Wisconsin 53045 / US
 [2018/28]
Former [2016/32]01 / James J. Kinsella
3009 York Road
TN, 37146 Pleasant View / US
02 / Peter Unsworth
12 Winterbourne Mews Lewes
BN7 1HG Sussex / GB
03 / Christoph J. Wieloch
18200 Beverly Hills Drive
Brookfiled Wisconsin 53045 / US
Former [2014/41]01 / James J. Kinsella
3009 York Road
TN, 37146 Pleasant View / US
02 / Peter Unsworth
12 Winterbourne Mews Lewes
BN7 1HG Sussex / GB
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/28]
Former [2014/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14160339.917.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS20131381586315.03.2013         Original published format: US201313815863
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787518
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787518
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787518
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01H9/56, H01H50/54, H02P1/32, H01P1/26, // H01H1/20
[2016/01]
Former International [2014/41]H01H9/56, H01H50/54, H02P1/32, // H01H1/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zweistufige Verbindung von Elektromotoren mit Hilfe von elektromagnetischen Schaltern[2014/41]
English:Two-step connection of electric motors by means of electromagnetic switches[2014/41]
French:Connexion en deux étapes de moteurs électriques au moyen de commutateurs électromagnétiques[2014/41]
Examination procedure05.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
27.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2018Fee for grant paid
30.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2017
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006035194  (UNSWORTH PETER J [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1492142  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN102368672  (ZHUZHOU NAT ENGINEERING RES CT OF CONVERTERS CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6,10,13 * paragraphs [0045] , [0074]; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]JPS63184225  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-7 *