Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784631 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784631



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 195
24.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
22.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
22.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
02.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 30
23.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
23.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
23.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 9
22.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
29.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
18.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
18.03.2014 Description Search / examination 17
18.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
18.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5