Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784631 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410114925 EP14160396



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014283599Global Dossier 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130031422 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20140116632Global Dossier 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130031422 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2014186731Global Dossier 02.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130031422 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104076922Global Dossier 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130031422 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2784631Global Dossier 18.05.2016B1
EP2784631 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130031422 25.03.2013