Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784631

EP2784631 - Method and wearable device to sense motion of user [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Sang Joon
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
02 / MUN, Min Young
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
03 / CHOI, Chang Mok
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
 [2016/20]
Former [2014/40]01 / Kim, Sang Joon
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
02 / Mun, Min Young
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
03 / Choi, Chang Mok
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/20]
Former [2014/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14160396.918.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2013003142225.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130031422
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784631
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784631
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0488, A61B5/11, G06F3/01, A61B5/00, G01B21/16, G01P13/00
[2015/51]
Former International [2014/40]G06F3/01, A61B5/11, A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und tragbare Vorrichtung zur Erfassung der Bewegung eines Benutzers[2014/40]
English:Method and wearable device to sense motion of user[2014/40]
French:Procédé et dispositif portable pour détecter un mouvement d'utilisateur[2014/40]
Examination procedure23.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
02.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU18.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU18.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008300055  (LUTNICK HOWARD W [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0083] , [0 86] , [ 102] , [ 113] , [ 600] *;
 [Y]FR2965060  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [Y] 1,7,15 * page 7, lines 15-24 * * page 8, lines 10-24 * * page 19, lines 11-21 * * page 25, lines 27-34 * * page 26, lines 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2008223131  (VANNUCCI GIOVANNI [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,7,15 * figure 1A * * paragraphs [0028] - [0033] - [0 37] - [0038] - [0 84] , [ 1117] *;
 [I]  - Ami LUTTWAK, "Human Motion Tracking and Orientation Estimation using inertial sensors and RSSI measurements", (20111228), URL: http://www.cs.huji.ac.il/~dolev/pubs/thesis/ami-msc-thesis.pdf, (20140806), XP055133501 [I] 1,2,4-10,12,13,15 * page 24, paragraph 3.1 * * page 25; figure 3.1 * * page 42, paragraph 4.2 - page 44 * * page 56; figure 5.1 * * page 81, paragraph 7 *
 [Y]  - HAMIE J ET AL, "Constrained decentralized algorithm for the relative localization of wearable wireless sensor nodes", 2013 IEEE SENSORS, IEEE, (20121028), doi:10.1109/ICSENS.2012.6411246, ISSN 1930-0395, pages 1 - 4, XP032308702 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSENS.2012.6411246
 [A]  - STUPP G ET AL, "The expected uncertainty of range-free localization protocols in sensor networks", THEORETICAL COMPUTER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 344, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3975, (20051111), pages 86 - 99, (20051111), XP027654934 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *