Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797063

EP2797063 - ERGONOMIC REMOTE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]Ergonomic remote control
[2017/10]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bigben Interactive SA
Rue de la Voyette C.R.T. 2
59818 Lesquin / FR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Allaert, Yannick
4 Bis Chemin du Halage
62410 Meurchin / FR
02 / Falc, Alain
Smokkelpotstraat (KOR) 73
8500 Kortrijk / BE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex - Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
3 chemin de l'Echo
1213 Onex Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date14160400.918.03.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateFR2013000064920.03.2013         Original published format: FR 1300649
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2797063
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2797063
Date:01.04.2015
Language:FR
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G08C17/02, H01H9/00, H01H9/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERGONOMISCHE FERNSTEUERUNG[2017/10]
English:ERGONOMIC REMOTE CONTROL[2017/10]
French:TÉLÉCOMMANDE ERGONOMIQUE[2017/10]
Former [2014/44]Ergonomische Fernsteuerung
Former [2014/44]Ergonomic remote control
Former [2014/44]Télécommande ergonomique
Examination procedure28.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
10.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
17.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1283535  (H2EYE INTERNATIONAL LTD [VG]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, paragraph 16 - column 3 * * claim 1 * * figures 5b,6 *;
 [Y]FR2940707  (WYPLAY [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 30 * * page 10, line 8 - line 26 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6164853  (FOOTE LISA L [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP2227005  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 9 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1854518
 EP1283535
 FR2940707