Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797063 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797063



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 129
30.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.05.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
10.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 15
23.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
28.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.04.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
20.02.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Priority document Search / examination 22
18.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
18.03.2014 Description Search / examination 10
18.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
18.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5