Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2797063


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.12.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
16.08.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.05.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
09.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.02.2017 Change - German title published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - English title published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - French title published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
25.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 Change - designated states published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - request for examination published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
30.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.02.2015 Publication of search report published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
27.02.2015 Change - classification published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
27.02.2015 Change - classification published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
28.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]