Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790108

EP2790108 - Information processing apparatus, memory control device, data transfer control method, and data transfer control program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.01.2018  [2018/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hayasaka, Kazumi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
02 / Higeta, Masanori
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
03 / Sugano, Fumitake
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14160891.920.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008165209.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013081652
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790108
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2790108
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/38, G06F13/16, G06F3/06
[2015/19]
Former International [2014/42]G06F13/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/46]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Speichersteuerungsvorrichtung, Datenübertragungssteuerungsverfahren, und Datenübertragungssteuerprogramm[2014/42]
English:Information processing apparatus, memory control device, data transfer control method, and data transfer control program[2014/42]
French:Appareil de traitement d'informations, dispositif de commande de mémoire, procédé de commande de transfert de données et programme de commande de transfert de données[2014/42]
Examination procedure06.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/46]
05.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/03]
29.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010161882  (STERN [IL] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]US2013024644  (GIVARGIS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] *
by applicantJP2005202942