Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796091

EP2796091 - Pulse estimation device and pulse estimation program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Kasama, Kouichirou
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date14160901.620.03.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateJP2013009306925.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013093069
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796091
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796091
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/024, A61B5/11
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Pulsabschätzungsvorrichtung und Pulsabschätzungsprogramm[2014/44]
English:Pulse estimation device and pulse estimation program[2014/44]
French:Dispositif et programme d'estimation d'impulsion[2014/44]
Examination procedure15.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2016Fee for grant paid
13.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.03.2014
AL16.03.2016
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
LU20.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU20.03.2014
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
LU20.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU20.03.2014
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
LU20.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU20.03.2014
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/40]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE20.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2520222  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0043 ] - [ 0046] - [ 0051 ] - [ 0052] - [ 0063] * * paragraphs [0065 ] - [ 0075] - [ 0080] , [ 0087] , [ 00119 ] - [ 0121] * * figures 4, 5, 6A, 10 * * equations 1, 8 * [I] 3;
 [XA]US2007249949  (HADLEY DAVID M [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0032] * * figures 1, 4 * * claims 1, 2, 18 * * equation b * [A] 2-4;
 [XA]US2004043869  (SATO TOMIO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0045] , [ 0048] , [ 0058 ] - [ 0059] - [ 0128] * * figures 1, 4, 8 * * equation 5 * [A] 2,3
by applicantJP2009072417
 JP2012232010