Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790180

EP2790180 - Electronic cymbal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roland Corporation
2036-1 Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho
Kita-ku
Hamamatsu Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
[2015/34]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Roland Corporation
2036-1 Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho Kita-ku
431-1304 Shizuoka, Hamamatsu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshino, Kiyoshi
c/o Roland Corporation
2036-1 Nakagawa
Hosoe-Cho, Kita-Ku
Hamamatsu, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14161018.821.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008146709.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013081467
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790180
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790180
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G10H3/14, G10H7/00, G10H7/02, G10H1/32
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/42]G10H3/14, G10H7/00, G10H7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Zimbel[2014/42]
English:Electronic cymbal[2014/42]
French:Cymbale électronique[2014/42]
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
27.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2015Fee for grant paid
29.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2014
AL30.12.2015
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
PT30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.03.2014
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
PT30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU21.03.2014
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
PT30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU21.03.2014
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
PT30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU21.03.2014
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/47]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/16]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/08]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2016/47]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002059861  (YOSHINO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0090] *;
 [A]US2009139387  (TODA JIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]  Anonymous, "My Three Zone Ride w/ Choke (Stealth) - VDrums Forum", Internet, (20091201), URL: http://www.vdrums.com/forum/forum/advanced/diy/40865-my-three-zone-ride-w-choke-stealth, (20140730), XP055132410 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2003271134