Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784317

EP2784317 - Variable displacement swash plate compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Takahiro
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
02 / Ota, Masaki
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Shinya
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
04 / Honda, Kazunari
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
05 / Nishii, Kei
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
06 / Yamazaki, Yusuke
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14161021.221.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007075029.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013070750
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784317
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784317
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:F04B27/10
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Taumelscheibenverdichter mit variabler Verdrängung[2014/40]
English:Variable displacement swash plate compressor[2014/40]
French:Compresseur à plateau oscillant à déplacement variable[2014/40]
Examination procedure21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2017Fee for grant paid
23.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2014
AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
MT21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR09.05.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
MT21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR09.05.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/29]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
FR09.05.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/24]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/13]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/10]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XD]JPH01219364  (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [XD] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH04191472  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002081214  (HUANG YONG [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] *;
 [A]US6402480  (SUD LAVLESH [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 21 *;
 [A]US6394763  (HARTE SHANE A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 12 *
by applicantJPH01219364