Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790109

EP2790109 - Switching device, packet control method, and data communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.10.2015  [2015/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Koichi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
02 / Kuramoto, Masahiro
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14161073.321.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008163409.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013081634
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790109
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/38, H04L12/801, // H04L12/933
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Schaltvorrichtung, Paketsteuerungsverfahren und Datenkommunikationssystem[2014/42]
English:Switching device, packet control method, and data communication system[2014/42]
French:Dispositif de commutation, procédé de contrôle de paquets et système de communication de données[2014/42]
Examination procedure13.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
16.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/43]
02.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/43]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010306442  (GREGG THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0025] * [I] 2-5;
 [X]WO2006063297  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 7 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0037] , [0047] , [0051] *
by applicantJPH0730546