EP2790118 - Information processing apparatus and method for thermo-fluid analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Sachio c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Hiroki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Hiroshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Hashima, Masayoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Sato, Yuichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 14161197.0 | 21.03.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | JP20130083337 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013083337 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2790118 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2790118 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
G06F30/33 (EP,US);
G01K13/02 (US);
G06F2111/10 (EP,US);
G06F2119/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Thermofluidanalyse | [2014/42] | English: | Information processing apparatus and method for thermo-fluid analysis | [2014/42] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations et procédé d'analyse thermo-fluide | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - PENG DING ET AL, "A fast and efficient method for predicting fluid flow and heat transfer problems", JOURNAL OF HEAT TRANSFER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200803), vol. 130, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1481, pages 1 - 17, XP009109466 [I] 1-6 * Abstract & Introduction, lines 1-14;; figures 1-15 * | by applicant | JP2005309755 | JP2007179501 | JP2009258879 |