Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786746

EP2786746 - Stabilizing a liquid formulation containing a protein drug [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/43]Stabilizing a liquid formulation containing a protein drug
[2014/41]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, In Hwan
101-904, Halla Vivaldi APT., Dangsu-dong
Gwonsun-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Dong Uk
106-603, Daemyung Lakeville APT, Yeongduk-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Kim, Geun Woong
407-704, Humansia, Seocheon maeul, Seocheon-dong
823, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Sung, Hee Kyung
6112-1903, Central Town-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Jeong, Yun Ju
1006-1201, Jinangolmaeul
Jugong 10-danji, Jinan-dong
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14161403.225.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003489329.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130034893
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786746
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/18, A61K47/26
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Stabilisierung einer flüssigen Formulierung mit einem Proteinarzneimittel[2014/41]
English:Stabilizing a liquid formulation containing a protein drug[2014/41]
French:Stabilisant une formulation liquide contenant un médicament protéique[2014/41]
Former [2014/43]Stabilizing a liquid formulation containing a protein drug
Former [2014/43]Stabilisant une formulation liquide contenant un médicament protéique
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure08.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009226443  (FILVAROFF ELLEN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * example 4 *;
 [X]GB2404660  (PFIZER PROD INC [US]; ABGENIX INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0195] *;
 [XP]WO2013078170  (GENENTECH INC [US]; HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [XP] 1-17 * paragraph [0330] - paragraph [0332] *
by applicantKR20110047698