Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783941

EP2783941 - Steering column apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2016  [2016/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakata, Toru
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]01 / Sakata, Toru
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14161440.425.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013006566727.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013065667
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783941
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/184, // B62D1/187
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Lenksäulenvorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Steering column apparatus[2014/40]
French:Appareil de colonne de direction[2014/40]
Examination procedure18.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
24.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/18]
14.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2015
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2223842  (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038]; figures 5,12,13,16 * [Y] 4 [I] 6,7;
 [Y]EP2361817  (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] - [0 39] - [0041]; figures 3-5,7 *;
 [A]EP2282920  (ZF SYSTEMES DE DIRECTION NACAM S A S [FR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1,3,4 *
by applicantJP2011178231
 JP2012111364