Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2783941 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2783941



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 166
29.03.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
24.06.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.06.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
24.06.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 29
09.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
14.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 6
04.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
25.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
25.03.2014 Description Search / examination 19
25.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
25.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5