Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2783941


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.04.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
13.12.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.06.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.06.2015 Change - inventor
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
07.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
26.12.2014 Change - designated states published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Change - request for examination published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]