Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783944

EP2783944 - Vehicle steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kouchi, Tatsuma
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
 [2014/47]
Former [2014/40]01 / Kouxhi, Tatsuma
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14161441.225.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007055228.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013070552
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783944
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783944
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62D5/04
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeuglenksystem[2014/40]
English:Vehicle steering system[2014/40]
French:Système de direction de véhicule[2014/40]
Examination procedure11.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
19.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2015Fee for grant paid
22.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2015
Opposition(s)11.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2014
AL08.07.2015
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU25.03.2014
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.03.2014
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU25.03.2014
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.03.2014
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2017/41]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU25.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU25.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU25.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT08.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2004161073  (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008066991  (KATAOKA MOTOAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0032] - [0061] - [0104] - [0110] * * figures 1,2,3A,6 *;
 [A]US2009294206  (OBLIZAJEK KENNETH L [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] - [0021] - [0024] , [0025] , [0029] - [0033] - [0035] , [0036] , [0039] - [0041] - [0055] , [0056] * * figure - *;
 [A]DE102005051442  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6250421  (POSHADLO MICHAEL LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007044756  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2009184627