Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785070

EP2785070 - Method and apparatus for improving quality of experience in sharing screen among devices, and recording medium therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Yong-tae
113-104, 363, Hyowon-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Shin-ae
4-307, 31, Seungbang 7-gil, Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Baek, Yun-sun
802-1505, 232, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2017/29]
Former [2014/40]01 / Kim, Yong-tae
113-104, 363, Hyowon-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Shin-ae
4-307, 31, Seungbang 7-gil, Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Baek, Yun-sun
802-1505, 232, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[2017/29]
Former [2014/40]Davies, Robert Ean , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date14161452.925.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS201361804804P25.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361804804 P
KR2013003884309.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130038843
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785070
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785070
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/414, H04N21/4402, H04N21/442, G06F3/14, H04L29/06, H04L12/853
[2016/51]
Former International [2014/40]H04N21/414, H04N21/4402, H04N21/442, G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Erfahrung bei der gemeinsamen Nutzung eines Bildschirms zwischen Einrichtungen und Aufzeichnungsmedium dafür[2014/40]
English:Method and apparatus for improving quality of experience in sharing screen among devices, and recording medium therefor[2014/40]
French:Procédé et appareil pour améliorer la qualité d'expérience dans le partage d'écran entre dispositifs et support d'enregistrement associé[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
04.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2016
14.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2017Fee for grant paid
07.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2015
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU25.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012133727  (BOLDUC ROBERT [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0067]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2011141123  (KUMAR B ANIL [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,7-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0068] - [0079]; figures 7,8 *;
 [X]US2011173256  (KHALATIAN IGOR [US]) [X] 1,3,8,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] *;
 [A]US2012191784  (LEE CHUNG-I [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0013] - [0015] - [0 23]; figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - BOYACI O ET AL, "BASS Application Sharing System", MULTIMEDIA, 2008. ISM 2008. TENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081215), ISBN 978-0-7695-3454-1, pages 432 - 439, XP031535111 [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-15 * Section 1 * * Section 3 * * Section 6.3 * * Section 6.4 *