Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787420

EP2787420 - Touch display unit and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Joodo
19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / Jeon, Seongman
19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / Kim, Yongdae
19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
04 / Kim, Donghyun
19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/18]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/41]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14161476.825.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003534501.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130035345
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787420
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787420
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787420
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, G06F3/041, G06F3/045, G02F1/1335
[2017/46]
Former International [2014/41]G06F3/045, G02F1/1335
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Berührungsempfindliche Anzeigeeinheit und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2014/41]
English:Touch display unit and method for manufacturing the same[2014/41]
French:Unité d'affichage tactile et son procédé de fabrication[2014/41]
Examination procedure25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2018Fee for grant paid
02.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2017
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2012241198  (KAJIYA SHUNICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,13 * paragraphs [0071] , [0075] , [0084] , [0107] , [0109] - [0112] - [0120] , [0156] - [0162] - [0166] , [0167] , [0212] - [0234]; figures 2B,2A,11,20-23 * [A] 8,12 [Y] 11,14 [I] 3,6,15;
 [Y]US2010075114  (KURIHARA KAZUMA [JP] ET AL) [Y] 11,14 * paragraphs [0058] - [0066]; figure 1 *