Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787420 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2787420



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 244
08.03.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.05.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.03.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
02.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
02.03.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
09.11.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 39
27.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
02.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
02.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
02.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.01.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
16.06.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
25.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
25.03.2014 Description Search / examination 21
25.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 14
25.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5