Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749172

EP2749172 - Filled milk product comprising solids of sweet buttermilk [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, SK
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arla Foods Amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KIERBYE, Ida
Industriarealet 60
6990 Ulfborg / DK
02 / TOFT, Jacob Randeris
Vermundsgade 6
8260 Viby J / DK
 [2015/07]
Former [2014/27]01 / KIERBYE, Ida
Industriarealet 60
6990 Ulfborg / DK
02 / TOFT NIELSEN, Jacob
Ny Munkegade 62, 3. th
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Representative(s)Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[2018/30]
Former [2014/27]Østergaard, Steen
Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date14161513.814.02.2011
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateUS20100303776P12.02.2010         Original published format: US 303776 P
DK2010007054110.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201070541
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749172
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2749172
Date:25.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A23C11/04, A23C17/00
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/30]
Former [2014/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gefülltes Milchprodukt enthaltend trockenes Material von süsser Buttermilch[2018/28]
English:Filled milk product comprising solids of sweet buttermilk[2014/27]
French:Produit de lait emballé comprenant des solides de babeurre doux[2014/27]
Former [2014/27]Gefülltes Milchprodukt enthaltend trockenes Material von süsser Buttermilch
Examination procedure02.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/08]
11.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2017
04.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.05.2018Fee for grant paid
15.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
15.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11702852.2  / EP2533650
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.04.2019  02.05.2019  ADMISSIBLE
FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V.
Stationsplein 4
3818 LE Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2019/23]
10.05.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/22]AL25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/11]HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/08]LT25.07.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT25.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4446164  (BROG ROY A [US]) [AD] 1-15 * column 1, lines 18-37 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, lines 30-63 *;
 [A]US5993873  (KUSLYS MARTINAS [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 7-9,52-64 * * column 4, lines 62-65 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5962062  (CARRIE ANNE-LISE [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 14-67 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 38 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US1432699  (KINZER PHILIP G) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 27-64 * * page 2, lines 108-114 *;
 [A]FR2017282  (BRATLAND ARTHUR) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 14-32 * * page 5, lines 16-30 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 5 * * examples 7,9,11 *;
 [A]GB730887  (SEPARATOR AB) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 15-24 * * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 11 *
ExaminationGB2163445
    - Anonymous, "Non-dairy extra creamer", MINTEL, (20070724), pages 1 - 3, URL: www.gnpd.com, (20170206), XP055342495
by applicantUS4446164
 US5993873
    - CHRISTIE, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 10 - 12
OppositionUS2008206434
 US4446164
 US5993873
 US3798339
 US5962062
 GB730887
 EP0458310
 EP0294119
    - Anonymous, "Relative Sweetness Values for Various Sweeteners", LaVic, Inc,, (20110316), XP055434432
    - SODINI et al., "Compositional and Functional Properties of Buttermilk: A Comparison Between Sweet, Sour, and Whey Buttermilk", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (20060200), vol. 89, pages 525 - 536, XP026944999

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(06)72115-4
    - D.F. Newstead, "Sweet-cream buttermilk powders: key functional ingredients for recombined milk products", D.F. Newstead, N/A, 3rd International Symposium on Recombined Milk & Milk Products, International Dairy Federation, (19990000), pages 55 - 60, XP055588056
    - KAREN SMITH, "Dried Dairy Ingredients", Wisconsin Center for Dairy Research, (20080515), pages 1 - 59, XP055185315
    - OBENDORF, Ralph L., Kosina, Suzanne M., "Chapter 13- Soluble Carbohydrates in Soybean in Soybean", OBENDORF, Ralph L., Kosina, Suzanne M., Tzi-Bun Ng, Soybean- Biochemistry , Chemistry and Physiology, InTech, (20110400), pages 202 - 228, XP055588280
    - N/A, "General Properties of Casein - Casein and other Milk Protein Products", Sigma-aldrich, URL: https://www.sigmaaldrich.com/life-science/metabolomics/enzyme-explorer/enzyme-reagents/casein.html
    - Anonymous, "General Properties of Casein", Internet Archive, Wayback Machine, (20090802), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090802190606/https://www.sigmaaldrich.com/life-science/metabolomics/enzyme-explorer/enzyme-reagents/casein.html, XP055588291
    - Anonymous, "Peptide Stability", Internet Archive, Wayback Machine, (20081204), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20081204044844/https:/www.sigmaaldrich.com/life-science/custom-oligos/custom-peptides/learning-center/peptide-stability.html, XP055588292
    - NEWSTEAD D F; GOLDMANN A, "RECOMBINED MILKS AND CREAMS", BULLETIN FEDERATION INTERNATIONALE DE LAITERIE, (19790000), pages 7 - 13, XP001152664