EP2785042 - Image processing apparatus and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasutomi, Kei c/o RICOH COMPANY, LIMITED 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14161536.9 | 25.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130071275 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013071275 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785042 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H04N1/6011 (EP,US);
G06F3/1256 (US);
G06F3/1208 (US);
H04N1/6086 (EP,US);
H04N1/6097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2014/40] | English: | Image processing apparatus and image processing method | [2014/40] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.07.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009130461 (CANON KK) [A] 1,12-15* abstract *; | [I]US2011007333 (ISHII MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,12-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - BENJAMIN A. DARLING ET AL, "Tangible display systems: direct interfaces for computer-based studies of surface appearance", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20100202), vol. 7527, doi:10.1117/12.845182, ISSN 0277-786X, page 75270Q, XP055125997 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.845182 | [A] - ROHIT PATIL ET AL, "3D Simulation of prints for improved soft proofing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COLOR IMAGING CONFERENCE: COLOR SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, TECHNOLOGIES, APPLICATIONS, Scottsdale, Arizona, USA, ISBN 0-89208-254-2, (20041109), pages 193 - 199, URL: http://www.rit-mcsl.org/fairchild/PDFs/PRO23.pdf, (20140701), XP008170208 [A] 1,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2010152533 | JP2010246049 | JP2012044421 |