Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789567

EP2789567 - Operational brake of an elevator, and an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kone Corporation
Kartanontie 1
00330 Helsinki / FI
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Vlasov, Timo
Hinaajankatu 3 as 8
15140 Lahti / FI
02 / Saarelainen, Antti
Vallikatu 9 B 10
02650 Espoo / FI
03 / Kantanen, Kaisa
Koivurannantie 9
11130 Riihimäki / FI
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
[2016/20]
Former [2014/42]Graf Glück Kritzenberger
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date14161545.025.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateFI2013000536412.04.2013         Original published format: FI 20135364
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789567
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789567
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:B66D5/04, F16D49/00, F16D69/04, F16D121/20
[2015/48]
Former International [2014/42]B66D5/04, F16D49/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betriebsbremse eines Aufzugs sowie ein Aufzug[2014/42]
English:Operational brake of an elevator, and an elevator[2014/42]
French:Frein opérationnel d'un ascenseur et ascenseur[2014/42]
Examination procedure26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
13.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2016Fee for grant paid
17.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16152435.0  / EP3028984
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU25.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU25.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202011001482U  (INTORQ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * [I] 4-9,11,12