Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785159

EP2785159 - Kit including two hinged parts provided with a locking means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hager Security
Rue du Pré de l'Orme
38920 Crolles / FR
[2017/09]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Hager Security
Rue du Pré de l'Orme
38920 Crolles / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Badel, Christian
70 rue du Vercors
38920 Crolles / FR
02 / Nieto, Yves
31 avenue Jean Jaurès
73000 Chambery / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Nuss, Laurent , et al
Cabinet Nuss
10, rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
[2017/09]
Former [2014/40]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date14161577.325.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateFR2013005271826.03.2013         Original published format: FR 1352718
[2014/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785159
Date:01.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785159
Date:01.03.2017
Language:FR
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/02, G08B17/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Kasten, der zwei über Gelenke verbundene Teile umfasst, die mit Verriegelungsmitteln ausgestattet sind[2014/40]
English:Kit including two hinged parts provided with a locking means[2014/40]
French:Coffret comprenant deux parties articulées munies de moyen de verrouillage[2014/40]
Examination procedure31.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
02.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2017Fee for grant paid
17.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2014
AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
IE25.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
IE25.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/13]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
IE25.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.03.2017
CZ01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0445346  (PITTWAY CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2707784  (NEUTRONIC [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1988526  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *