Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784651

EP2784651 - Transmitter with rotating knob [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
[2019/38]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyazaki, Hiroshi
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP
02 / Nakayama, Takafusa
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP
03 / Iwata, Yosuke
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date14161622.725.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013006368526.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013063685
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784651
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784651
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784651
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0487, G06F3/0362, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0484
[2015/13]
Former International [2014/40]G06F3/0487, G06F3/0362
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sende-/Empfangsgerät mit Drehknopf[2014/40]
English:Transmitter with rotating knob[2014/40]
French:Transmetteur avec bouton rotatif[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
19.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2019Fee for grant paid
06.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005037814  (YASUI SHIGEYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 6,7,8-10, 11A-11D, 12A,12B, 13, 14 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0087] *;
 [I]US2008040685  (KOLLETZKI JOHANNES [DE]) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0059] *
by applicantJP2013030349