EP2784595 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mugita, Naoki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/40] | Application number, filing date | 14161641.7 | 26.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130066777 | 27.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013066777 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784595 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/09 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
G03G15/0907 (EP,US);
G03G15/0844 (US);
G03G15/065 (US);
G03G15/0806 (US);
G03G15/09 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2014/40] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2014/40] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 16.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008206661 (FUJISHIMA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004002015 (OZAWA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2010231017 | US2010247164 | JP2000112237 | JP2008139400 | JP2006023327 |