Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792604

EP2792604 - Container handling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Hafner, Dieter
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / Eichhammer, Tobias
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
03 / Högl, Bernhard
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
04 / Bergers, Andreas
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/17]
Former [2014/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14161648.226.03.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateDE20131020666715.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013206667
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792604
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792604
Date:27.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65C9/00, B67C7/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Behälterbehandlungsmaschine[2014/43]
English:Container handling machine[2014/43]
French:Machine de traitement de récipient[2014/43]
Examination procedure16.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
03.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2016Fee for grant paid
03.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2014
AL27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU26.03.2014
AL27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2019/39]HU26.03.2014
AL27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU26.03.2014
AL27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012117426  (KOSME S R L UNIPERSONALE [IT]; CATTABRIGA DENIS [IT]) [X] 1-5 * page 5, line 1 - line 29 * * page 9, line 10 - line 18 * * figures 1, 12, 13 *;
 [X]DE8903884U  (HERMANN KRONSEDER) [X] 1-5 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]EP0539735  (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 25 - line 26 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]DE202007017932U  (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *
by applicantWO2011027372
 WO2011045819