Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2792604 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2792604



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
03.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
04.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
20.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
20.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Priority document Search / examination 31
26.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Description Search / examination 15
26.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 9
26.03.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 5
26.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5